skip to content

Alassaf, Abeer Ahmed Mohammad

CPSO#: 92017

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 21 Aug 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 12 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012