skip to content

Alarakhia, Mohamed

CPSO#: 88754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J0E2
Phone: (519) 904-0656
Fax: (519) 904-0658 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 783-0023
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Canada
Phone: (519) 578-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohamed Alarakhia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alarakhia ( CPSO# 88754 )

Business Address:
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2H 0E2
Phone Number: (519) 904-0656

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0023

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ALARAKHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARAKHIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010