skip to content

Taniguchi, Alan

CPSO#: 59999

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
100 Main Street West -- 2nd Fl
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 20494 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 10 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 23 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 May 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 May 2019 Active
             As from May 10, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alan Taniguchi in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Taniguchi to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ALAN TANIGUCHI
                                          ("Dr. Taniguchi")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, certificate of registration number 59999, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that, after an investigation into my
                  practice, including a review of patient charts by a Medical Inspector,
                  the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College referred
                  allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee in a
                  Notice of Hearing dated October 10, 2018.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective May 10, 2019.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, to be selected from all locations where I am
                              employed, including any long-term care facility and/or
                              Hospital;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical
                        inspector dated August 12, 2018 and August 23, 2018, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of May 10, 2019.
                  (f)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a review and written summary the College policy Professional
                              Responsibilities in Postgraduate Medical Education: 
                  
                        (ii)  individualized instruction in medical ethics satisfactory to
                              the College, with an instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to complete this requirement by August
                        10, 2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time,
                        by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Taniguchi was referred to the Discipline Committee on
                              allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these
                              allegations, Dr. Taniguchi agreed to practise under the
                              guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                              for 6 months; to engage in professional education in
                              professional responsibilities in post-graduate medical
                              education, and medical ethics; and undergo a reassessment of
                              his practice by an assessor selected by the College within 6
                              months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Taniguchi, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Taniguchi, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 May 2019
Summary:

On May 10, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the 
Discipline Committee found that Dr. Taniguchi committed an act of professional misconduct, in 
that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, and 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION (LIABILITY) 
 
Dr. Taniguchi is 54 years old. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent 
practice in 1991. He practices in Hamilton, Ontario in the area of palliative care. He previously 
also practiced in the area of long-term care medicine. 
 
In addition to his clinical practice, Dr. Taniguchi is an Assistant Clinical Professor at McMaster 
University, and the Program Director of McMaster’s Family Medicine Palliative Care Residency 
Program. At the time of the events at issue, in addition to his clinical duties, Dr. Taniguchi had 
significant teaching, academic, and administrative responsibilities. 
 
Failure to comply with SCERP 
On July 15, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
of Ontario (“the College”) required Dr. Taniguchi to participate in a specified continuing 
education or remediation program (“SCERP”) consisting of: 
   -  a review and written summary of a College policy, and a section of the Practice Guide; 
   -  a period of clinical supervision, in which Dr. Taniguchi was required to meet with a 
      supervisor monthly for six months and review 10 charts at each meeting; and 
   -  a reassessment of his practice. 
Dr. Taniguchi was notified of the Committee’s decision on August 5, 2016.  He was required to 
retain a clinical supervisor within 30 days of receiving the decision. 
 
Dr. Taniguchi did not retain a clinical supervisor, or undergo a reassessment, pursuant to the 
SCERP. Dr. Taniguchi failed to respond to correspondence from the College on August 16, 
2016, November 22, 2016 and January 2, 2017 with respect to his compliance with the SCERP. 
Dr. Taniguchi submitted the required written summary on June 23, 2017. 
                                                                               
Breach of Order 
On May 10, 2017, the QAC made an Order imposing terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. 
Taniguchi’s certificate of registration. Under the Order, Dr. Taniguchi was required to obtain a 
clinical supervisor acceptable to the College within 14 days of the Order, and meet with the 
clinical supervisor monthly to review 10 long-term care patient charts. The Order was to remain 
in effect until May 9, 2018. If Dr. Taniguchi was unable to retain a clinical supervisor as required 
by the Order, he was required to cease practicing long-term care until such time as he had done 
so. 
On May 25, 2017, Dr. Taniguchi proposed that Dr. David Chan be approved as his supervisor.  
On May 31, 2017, the College confirmed that Dr. Chan was approved. On June 7, 2017, the 
College advised Dr. Taniguchi that it had received Dr. Chan’s executed undertaking, and that Dr. 
Taniguchi was permitted to return to practice. 
Dr. Taniguchi had his first and only meeting with Dr. Chan on September 8, 2017: 
   -  there were “no deficiencies identified” in Dr. Taniguchi’s charts; and 
   -  “Dr. Taniguchi has made a lot of progress. His documentation is excellent and in my 
      opinion meets the standard of documentation in a [long-term care] setting”.  
Although Dr. Chan’s initial report was favorable, Dr. Taniguchi states that he felt overwhelmed. 
He failed to arrange follow-up meetings with Dr. Chan. Dr. Chan emailed Dr. Taniguchi twice 
after their first meeting to encourage Dr. Taniguchi to schedule their next meeting, but Dr. 
Taniguchi did not respond. 
On January 26, 2018, Dr. Taniguchi was notified that he was in breach of the Order, and was 
advised to meet with Dr. Chan and review 40 charts with him by February 8, 2018 to bring 
himself back into compliance. Dr. Taniguchi failed to do so. 
On February 12, 2018, Dr. Chan advised the College that he had not heard from Dr. Taniguchi, 
and withdrew as Dr. Taniguchi’s clinical supervisor. Dr. Taniguchi ceased practicing long-term 
care in February 2018. 
 
Section 75 Investigation 
In addition to making the Order described above, the QAC also disclosed to the ICRC Dr. 
Taniguchi’s name, as well as the allegations that he may have committed an act of professional 
misconduct, including but not limited to lack of governability, or that he may be incompetent or 
incapacitated. The Registrar appointed investigators to investigate whether Dr. Taniguchi, in his 
general medicine practice, including his long-term care and palliative care, had engaged in 
professional misconduct or was incompetent. 
 
Dr. Taniguchi was notified of the investigation on July 13, 2017. The investigator asked Dr. 
Taniguchi to complete a Physician Practice Questionnaire and an Electronic Records 
Questionnaire, and return them to the College within 10 business days. Dr. Taniguchi did not 
respond. The investigator sent several further requests for Dr. Taniguchi’s completed 
questionnaires between October 2017 and February 2018, to which Dr. Taniguchi did not 
respond. The College did not receive Dr. Taniguchi’s completed questionnaires. 
 
The College retained Dr. Benoit Robert to opine on Dr. Taniguchi’s care of 25 patients in both 
palliative care and long-term care practices. 
 
On April 16, 2018, the investigator wrote to Dr. Taniguchi advising him that Dr. Robert had 
requested to interview Dr. Taniguchi for the purposes of preparing his opinion. Dr. Taniguchi did 
not respond to this letter, and did not attend for an interview with Dr. Robert.  
 
With respect to Dr. Taniguchi’s palliative care practice, Dr. Robert opined: 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi’s pattern of documentation was consistent with a physician who practiced 
      “at a distance”. It was unclear from much of the documentation provided whether Dr. 
      Taniguchi had direct contact with patients. Although Dr. Taniguchi was a consultant in a 
      teaching setting, his charting pattern was suggestive of not being available on a consistent 
      basis; 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi’s documentation of encounters did not follow a “SOAP” format, or a 
      problem-based approach. His notes contained minimal subjective and objective data, and 
      his assessments and plans were cursory. There was limited evidence of physical 
      examinations; 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi demonstrated a significant lack of knowledge of appropriate 
      documentation. The paucity of charting and documentation interfered with Dr. Robert’s 
      ability to opine on Dr. Taniguchi’s knowledge with respect to palliative care. The lack of 
      documentation also precluded an accurate assessment of Dr. Taniguchi’s skill; and 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi was not readily available to assess patients in a timely fashion. While Dr. 
      Taniguchi’s clinical practice was unlikely to expose patients to harm or injury, this was 
      due to the rapid available backup by other qualified palliative care physicians on days on 
      which Dr. Taniguchi is not available. 
 
With respect to Dr. Taniguchi’s long-term care practice, Dr. Robert opined: 
      -  It was not clear from Dr. Taniguchi’s documentation in 2015 and 2016 that he was 
         performing admission physicals, nor was it clear that he was performing annual 
         physicals. There were a number of occasions on which these physicals were not 
         documented. Dr. Taniguchi’s extensive use of PRN orders in the order sets in some 
         charts also suggested that his approach to those residents’ care was not personalized; 
      -  There was a significant improvement in Dr. Taniguchi’s long-term care 
         documentation after mid-2017, with respect to his use of SOAP notes, and the 
         documentation of admission and annual exams, and care conferences; 
      -  Dr. Taniguchi’s knowledge and skill were difficult to ascertain from his charts. 
         However, there were instances in which Dr. Taniguchi’s charting suggested a lack of 
         knowledge and/or skill. In one case, Dr. Taniguchi failed to follow through on a 
         psychiatry note outlining the need for quarterly monitoring of the patient’s liver 
         function tests. In another case, Dr. Taniguchi failed to address rising creatinine levels 
         in an elderly patient who was prescribed Ramipril, and who later developed acute-on-
         chronic renal failure; and 
      -  Dr. Taniguchi was not readily available to assess his patient load, and his lack of 
         availability was concerning. His practice of attending on patients only every two 
         weeks allowed for conditions to aggravate between visits. It also appeared that he was 
         not available between visits. The use of email did not seem to expedite 
         communication. It also was not clear that the email channels used were secure, and 
         Dr. Taniguchi’s email correspondence at times comingled patients’ personal health 
         information. 
             
Section 25.4 Order 
On November 8, 2018, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee made an Order under s. 
25.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (“s. 25.4 Order”), requiring, among other things, 
that Dr. Taniguchi practice under the guidance of a clinical supervisor. 
 
On November 23, 2018, Dr. Anne Woods was approved as Dr. Taniguchi’s clinical supervisor.  
Since that time, Dr. Taniguchi has been fully cooperative with the College, and has been meeting 
with Dr. Woods on a regular basis to review patient charts from his palliative care practice 
pursuant to the s. 25.4 Order. Dr. Woods’s reports have been positive, and indicate that Dr. 
Taniguchi’s care has been appropriate. 
 
As Dr. Woods has noted in her reports: 
   -  “Once aware of the requirements for charting, Dr. Taniguchi's notes have met all 
      requirements, have addressed concerns raised in the previous audit, and reflect a care that 
      is exemplary.  I have made only one recommendation: ‘Ensure the documented physical 
      exam reflects all major concerns noted as issues that day.’” 
   -  “Dr. Taniguchi’s notes consistently reflect a high quality of care, supervision, education, 
      collegiality, and graciousness”; and 
   -  “Dr. Taniguchi has the reputation in the wider palliative medicine community as being 
      the doctor’s doctor, the one physicians would choose to have look after them. He is 
      known for his unremitting respect for other physicians, his knowledge, and his hard 
      work”. 
             
ADMISSION 
             
Dr. Taniguchi admits the facts above, and admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in 
professional misconduct under in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
             
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS (PENALTY) 
             
Dr. Taniguchi states that, between 2016 and 2018, he was feeling overwhelmed by his 
professional responsibilities, and was struggling to cope, and that this contributed to his failure to 
comply with the SCERP, and his failure to be responsive to the College. 
 
In order to address the issues that contributed to his conduct in this case, Dr. Taniguchi is 
working to reorganize his workload. He has stepped down from some of his academic 
responsibilities, and has recently moved to a lower-volume clinical environment. Dr. Taniguchi 
has also seen a counsellor, to help him develop his stress management and coping skills. 
 
On May 8, 2019, Dr. Taniguchi entered into an undertaking with the College by which he agreed 
to, among other things: 
   -  practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 
      months; 
   -  engage in professional education in professional responsibilities in post-graduate medical 
      education, and medical ethics; and 
   -  undergo a reassessment of his practice by an assessor selected by the College within 6 
      months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 

DISPOSITION 

The Discipline Committee Ordered that: 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Taniguchi’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months. 
   -  Dr. Taniguchi pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 2019 1:00 p.m. start time

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)