skip to content

Alamri, Nasser Faraj M

CPSO#: 100562

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014