skip to content

Alameldin, Mona

CPSO#: 96773

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:08 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 09 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Sep 2012
CF - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2014