skip to content

Alam, Nural

CPSO#: 28989

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 26 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jan 2019

Summary

Date of Death: 26-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkwood Psychiatric Hospital 550 Wellington Rd London, ON N6C 5J1
Date Received: 17 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 2019
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 26 Jan 2019