skip to content

Alam, Naheed

CPSO#: 95143

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naheed Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2015