skip to content

Alali, Alaa Y A A

CPSO#: 94979

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2019