skip to content

Alak, Aiman

CPSO#: 95265

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Wing
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alak ( CPSO# 95265 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AIMAN ALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015