skip to content

Alahmadi, Majed Dakhel Aide

CPSO#: 92116

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:17 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Oct 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 28 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 26 Dec 2010 to 25 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 26 Dec 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Western University, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017