skip to content

Al-Zahrani, Hassan Ahmed Marwan

CPSO#: 97378

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 23 May 2012
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
CF - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013