skip to content

AlYoubi, Reem Abdullah H

CPSO#: 99221

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 16 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016