skip to content

Al-Watban, Lemmese Farouk A

CPSO#: 92080

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Apr 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014