skip to content

Al-Tukmachi, Ahmad Mohammed Shihab

CPSO#: 94408

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kufa University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-849 UPPER WENTWORTH ST
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: 905-3899099
Fax: (519) 371-5995 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al-Tukmachi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Tukmachi ( CPSO# 94408 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2

Business Address:
Suite 201
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 389-9099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMED SHIHAB AL-TUKMACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-TUKMACHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2014