skip to content

Al-Sukhni, Eisar

CPSO#: 86509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1225
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eisar Al-Sukhni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Al-Sukhni ( CPSO# 86509 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
1225 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2-109
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EISAR AL-SUKHNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SUKHNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2015