skip to content

Al-Sughayir, Ammar Hasan Ali

CPSO#: 85564

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 May 2008
CF - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009