skip to content

AlShehry, Nawal Faiez Gharamah

CPSO#: 96179

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 20 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013