skip to content

Al-Shamsi, Mohammed Rashid Abdullah

CPSO#: 96175

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Oman

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 07 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019