skip to content

Al-Shamsi, Humaid Obaid

CPSO#: 86148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University College, Cork, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alzahra Hospital
The Department of Oncology
Dubai
Dubai 00000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97143786666
Fax: (888) 301-1432

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMAID OBAID AL-SHAMSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 26 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011