skip to content

Al-Selahi, Eiman Mohammad S A

CPSO#: 86087

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107-3885 Duke of York BLVD
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Phone: (905)3664441
Fax: (905) 366-4443 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

849 UPPER WENTWORTH ST
Suite 202
Hamilton ON  L9A5H4
Canada
Phone: 9053892929
Fax: 9053891414
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

115 Hamilton st N
Unit 15-B
Waterdown ON  L0R2H6
Canada
Phone: 905-690-1670
Fax: 905-689-9689
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3885 Duke of York Blvd C107
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-4441
Fax: 9053664443
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:04 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EIMAN MOHAMMAD S A AL-SELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SELAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 May 2007 to 30 May 2007
EL - Paediatric Haematology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 21 Mar 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Mar 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
EL - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Apr 2010
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 31 May 2010
EL - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Nov 2016
CF - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017