skip to content

AlSanad, Yazeed Hamad S

CPSO#: 100061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2018
EXPIRY DATE
01 Nov 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Sharjah, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center of Addiction & Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto, ON, M6J 1H4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 33448
Fax: 4165831296 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Camh
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Camh
33 Russell St
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.  Yazeed  Hamad S. AlSanad may practise psychiatry with the Centre for
                  Addiction and  Mental Health in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. AlSanad's  eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        AlSanad's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. AlSanad's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 2, 2018, and  will  expire  on  or
                  before November 1, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.