skip to content

Al-Saleh, Ayman Mohammad Othman

CPSO#: 86117

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
North Wing, Room 8N 01
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44728
Fax: (905) 577-1481 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Diagnostic and Cardiac C
250 Marlee Ave.
Toronto
ON
Toronto ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: 416-783-0000
Fax: 416-783-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AYMAN MOHAMMAD OTHMAN AL-SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 27 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2012