skip to content

Al-Saigh, Basil Behnam

CPSO#: 86161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Finch Weston Family Health Organiza
2367 FInch Avenue West - Unit B
Toronto ON  M9M 2W8
Phone: (416) 900-6697
Fax: (416) 900-6041 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al-Saigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Saigh ( CPSO# 86161 )

Business Address:
Finch Weston Family Health Organization
B - 2367 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M9M 2W8
Phone Number: (416) 900-0697


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASIL BEHNAM AL-SAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAIGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 24 Jun 2007
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010