skip to content

Al-Riyami, Ahmed Mohamed Salim

CPSO#: 99948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Mar 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 13 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
room 6-050a Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5104
Fax: 416-864-5849 Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED SALIM AL-RIYAMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-RIYAMI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-RIYAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-RIYAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-RIYAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-RIYAMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-RIYAMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2013 to 12 May 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020