skip to content

Al-Rawi, Firas Adil Tawfiq

CPSO#: 89632

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tawfiq, Firas Adil (used until: 08 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital,
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Firas A.T. Al-Rawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Rawi ( CPSO# 89632 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
Room RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Suite KDT 401
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5092

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:15 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FIRAS ADIL TAWFIQ AL-RAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2008 to 07 Oct 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2008 to 15 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013