skip to content

Al-Rasheedy, Intisar Mohammed Obaidallah Ali

CPSO#: 94588

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2010 to 20 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012