skip to content

Al-Rasheed, Taiba Abdulmohsen M

CPSO#: 87471

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - R - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2008 to 03 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2009 to 03 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 03 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014