skip to content

Al-Qwaiee, Mansour Mohammed Abdul-Mohsin

CPSO#: 93382

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Oct 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 16 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012