skip to content

AlQassmi, Amal Abdullah A

CPSO#: 96683

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015