skip to content

AlQahtani, Saeed Ali A

CPSO#: 97441

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Abdulaziz Medical City
Riyadh 11426
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966 8011111

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 43148
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAEED ALI A ALQAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 28 Jun 2012
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017