skip to content

AlQahatani, Saad Ayed A

CPSO#: 90417

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 May 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2011 to 16 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016