skip to content

Al-Qadhi, Samim Aziz Arif

CPSO#: 85445

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
279 Wharncliffe Rd N
Unite 209
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone: 519-601-5437 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bonavista Medical Centre
104-265 King George Rd
Bradford ON  N3R 6Y1
Canada
Phone: 519-759-4060
Fax: 519-759-8807
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samim Al-Qadhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Qadhi ( CPSO# 85445 )

Business Address:
104-265 King George Road
Brantford ON  N3R 6Y1

Business Address:
Dr. Samim Pediatric and Adolescent Care
279 Wharncliffe Road North
Unit 209
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone Number: 519-601-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMIM AZIZ ARIF AL-QADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-QADHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 20 Jul 2011 to 12 Oct 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 13 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Western University, 18 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016