skip to content

AlOtaibi, Naif Mitla S

CPSO#: 97633

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 02 Jul 2012
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019