skip to content

Al-Otaibi, Ali Dhohyan Edeis Al Maqati

CPSO#: 91753

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013