skip to content

AlOqaili, Yazeed Abdullah M

CPSO#: 99552

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2012 to 26 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013