skip to content

AlObaidi, Rashid Abdulaziz R

CPSO#: 87207

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Children Hospital 3E20 1280 Main St W Hamilton, ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 27 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2007 to 01 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2008 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2018