skip to content

AlNasser, Abdullah E A H

CPSO#: 95020

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018