skip to content

AlMusawi, Ali S M A

CPSO#: 87838

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 05 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
EL - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012