skip to content

Al-Mousawy, Saif

CPSO#: 95809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Premium Cardiac Centre Oakville
479 Dundas Street West
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone: 289-725-9997
Fax: 289-725-9797 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: 905-336-6480
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Premium Cardiac Centre Brampton
80 Maritime Ontario Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-7907
Fax: (905) 790-7909
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Al-Mousawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Mousawy ( CPSO# 95809 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone Number: 289-725-9997

Business Address:
227-80 Maritime Ontario Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E7
Phone Number: (905) 790-7907

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAIF AL-MOUSAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOUSAWY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015