skip to content

Al-Mohammedi, Faisal Abdulmohsen Hassan

CPSO#: 91228

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 12
9080 yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1435 Hurontario street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: 9056255600
Fax: 9056255650
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al-Mohammedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Mohammedi ( CPSO# 91228 )

Business Address:
206 - 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:28 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAISAL ABDULMOHSEN HASSAN AL-MOHAMMEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOHAMMEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011