skip to content

Al-Mehrezi, Abdulla M S A Saleh

CPSO#: 85438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010