skip to content

Al-Kudmani, Basheer Subhi B

CPSO#: 85953

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:20 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 02 Mar 2007
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016