skip to content

AlKudmani, Amer Subhi B

CPSO#: 85015

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Al-Kudmani, Aamir Sabhi B (used until: 09 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Jun 2006 to 10 Sep 2006
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012