skip to content

AlKhawaja, Sana Abdulaziz Abdulla

CPSO#: 89460

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2011