skip to content

Al-Juaid, Alaa Mohammed N

CPSO#: 97001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013