skip to content

Al-Janabi, Hasan Ahmad

CPSO#: 92862

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mill Pond Medical Centre
106 Victoria St W
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone: (705) 435-8800
Fax: (705) 434-4772 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Madison Ave
Granite City IL  62040
United States
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hasan Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:28 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active
 Dr.  Hasan  Ahmad  Al-Janabi  may  practise  medicine independently in internal
            medicine, critical care medicine and respirology, only.


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective January 2, 2020.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)