skip to content

AlHussain, Hussain Abdullah S

CPSO#: 85768

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013