skip to content

Al-Husari, Muhanad A Jalil

CPSO#: 84859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

230 Bertie St
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne ON  L3K2N7
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Maple Clinic
NA-House Calls
Toronto ON  M5V 1S2
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

BMC Pain Clinic
11-1130 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8H 7P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018
Corporation Name: Al-Husari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Husari ( CPSO# 84859 )

Business Address:
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 682-0444

Business Address:
GSH Medical
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Qatar

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHANAD A JALIL AL-HUSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HUSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009