skip to content

Al-Houssan, Walid

CPSO#: 85716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunrise Medical Centre
1460 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2E 5P2
Phone: (613) 727-7473
Fax: (613) 727-2754 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

309 desjardins boul
maniwaki QC  J9E 2E7
Canada
Phone: (819) 449-4690
Fax: (819) 441-3368
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al Houssan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 21 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Feb 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 16 Feb 2022 Active
 (1 of 3)
As from February 11, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. WALID AL-HOUSSAN
("Dr. Al-Houssan")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

PREAMBLE
In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, certificate of registration number 85716, am a member of the College.  
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that following public complaints that raised concerns about my standard of practice as a general practitioner, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised ongoing concerns about my standard of practice. 
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in addition to entering this Undertaking, I am also entering into an Undertaking restricting me from providing antenatal care in my practice. 
UNDERTAKING
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
Clinical Supervision 
(a)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
(b)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";
(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;
(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;
(iv)	Review at least twenty-five (25) of my patient charts at every meeting;
(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 
(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
(viii)	Submit a written report to the College at the end of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
(c)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated March 31, 2021, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
(d)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
(e)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within sixty (60) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
(f)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
(g)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
(h)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
Professional Education  
(i)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Review, reflection, and a discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following policies/guidance:            
1.	Medical Records Documentation, College Policy;
2.	Telemedicine, College Policy; 
3.	Virtual Care, draft College policy; 
4.	Advice to the Profession: Virtual Care, draft College guidance; 
5.	Managing Tests, College policy; and
(ii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.
(j)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(k)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.  
(l)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(m)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that if any of the resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
Reassessment of Practice
(n)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
(o)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
(p)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
(q)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
Monitoring 
(r)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(s)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(t)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
Public Register
(u)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(v)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Al-Houssan engaged in remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his general medicine practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice. As a result:
Dr. Al-Houssan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
Dr. Al-Houssan will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, managing test results and the provision of virtual care.
Dr. Al-Houssan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
(w)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.  
CONSENT
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:
(x)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(y)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(z)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(aa)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(bb)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
(cc)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;
(dd)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
(ee)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk 
of harm to my patients.

(2 of 3)
As from February 11, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. WALID AL-HOUSSAN
("Dr. Al-Houssan")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

PREAMBLE
In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, certificate of registration number 85716, am a member of the College.  
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that following public complaints that raised concerns about my standard of practice as a general practitioner, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised ongoing concerns about my standard of practice. 
UNDERTAKING
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
Restriction 
(a)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that I will not provide antenatal care to any patient, and will take immediate steps to refer any existing antenatal patients to another family physician or qualified specialist.  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to complete all referrals as specified above within one (1) month of signing this Undertaking.
(b)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to keep a log of my referrals of existing antenatal patients as set out in (a) above in the form attached at Appendix "A", which shall be provided to the College at any time upon request.

Monitoring 
(c)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(d)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(e)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(f)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
Public Register
(g)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(h)	I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Al-Houssan engaged in remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his general medicine practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Al-Houssan will not provide antenatal care to any patient.
CONSENT
I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(3 of 3)
As from December 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Al-Houssan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. WALID AL-HOUSSAN
                                          ("Dr. Al-Houssan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICRC" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
                  College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, certificate of registration number 85716, am a member
                  of the College.  
            (3)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, am aware of the College's concern about protecting the
                  public and acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my conduct and that the College is conducting an investigation
                  into the information

            (4)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude
                  the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with
                  the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently under investigation are disposed of by the
                  ICRC or, in the event of a referral to discipline, by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter(s)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                        "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in
                        this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand
                        that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time,
                        during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or
                        guardian of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                              1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice
                                    Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a
                                    monthly basis; 
                  
                              2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                                    Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                              3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters
                                    with patients, including but not limited to physical
                                    and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my
                                    obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all
                                    of my Professional Encounters with patients, including
                                    physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at
                                    all times; 
                  
                              4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except
                                    those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                                    attached as Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my
                                    Professional Encounters with patients; 
                  
                              5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                                    patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as
                                    Appendix "B" (the "Log");
                  
                              6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                                    patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                              7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                                    basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at
                        all times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall
                        post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Al-Houssan must not  have professional encounters, in person
                        or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone during any professional encounter
                        with any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to provide the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b), to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that if I elect, after the execution
                        of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s),
                        I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to provide to the College the
                        certified translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to
                        providing services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom
                        I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (8)(a), above. 
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline
                  Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the Registrar to
                  revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of
                  registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan is the subject of an investigation into
                              allegations of professional misconduct. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan must not engage in any professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                              in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated
                              health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the
                              other requirements provided in Dr. Al-Houssan's Undertaking
                              with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                              Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan shall post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Al-Houssan  must not have professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor
                              acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                              Ontario.  Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient
                              during any professional encounter. Further information may be
                              found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                  form, attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (22)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant
                  to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 11, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 11, 2022:

(1) Dr. Al-Houssan engaged in remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his general medicine practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice. As a result:
(2) Dr. Al-Houssan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.
(3) Dr. Al-Houssan will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, managing test results and the provision of virtual care.
(4) Dr. Al-Houssan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: February 11, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 11, 2022:

(1) Dr. Al-Houssan engaged in remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his general medicine practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Al-Houssan will not provide antenatal care to any patient.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 11, 2022, Dr. Al-Houssan has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 11, 2022, Dr. Al-Houssan has completed all elements of this CIP and SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 11, 2022, Dr. Al-Houssan has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 15, 2017:

Dr. Al-Houssan is the subject of an investigation into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result:

Dr. Al-Houssan must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Al-Houssan’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Al-Houssan shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Al-Houssan must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.