skip to content

Al-Homayeed, Badr Adbulrahman Homayeed

CPSO#: 85917

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 26 Jan 2007 to 28 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010